U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHAW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.