U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00705-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SNOW
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.