U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00690-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMERON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Errata]
  • January 10, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.