U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRICE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • November 09, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 03, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 01, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 18, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Suppress]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.