U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-gj-00048
  • Case Name: GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 10, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • February 16, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Clarify]
  • January 10, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.