U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 11, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order of Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Alter Judgment ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appear]
  • August 23, 2022: [Access]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.