U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JENKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 01, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.