U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GIUSTINO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 10, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 04, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.