U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. UBERTO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 11, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • January 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.