U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUSTOS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 07, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Vacate]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 23, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • January 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.