U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GALLOWAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.