U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00742-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALFOUR BEATTY COMMUNITIES, LLC
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 18, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.