U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROOKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 21, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • December 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 04, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.