U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Convert Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Hearing ]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Travel ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • June 27, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revoke]
  • March 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Stay]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • February 14, 2022: [Indictment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.