U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MACCRACKEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Bond ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Disclosure ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.