U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCHAEFER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.