U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RHODES, III et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply in Support]
  • January 24, 2023: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply to Opposition]
  • January 24, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2023: [Verdict Form ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • January 23, 2023: [Jury Notes ]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2023: [Jury Deliberation]
  • January 19, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 02, 2023: [Exclude]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • December 23, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Judgment NOV ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 18, 2022: [Rule]
  • December 13, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • December 13, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • December 12, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • December 12, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • December 11, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 11, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • December 11, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • December 09, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 08, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2022: [Access]
  • December 01, 2022: [In Limine ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • November 28, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Jury Deliberation]
  • November 23, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 21, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 20, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • November 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 10, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • October 05, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
  • October 03, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • October 03, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • October 02, 2022: [Order]
  • October 02, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • October 02, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Take Deposition ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 27, 2022: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • September 27, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 25, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • September 25, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 24, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 24, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • September 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Leave to Join]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 19, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 17, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • September 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • September 09, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 09, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 06, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 06, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for 404(b) Evidence]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 28, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 20, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 19, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Errata]
  • August 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 13, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 12, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • August 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 11, 2022: [HSD Filed]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • August 01, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 22, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • July 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 16, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • July 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 16, 2022: [Joinder]
  • July 14, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2022: [Strike ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 15, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Modify]
  • May 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • May 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Errata]
  • May 12, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • May 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Discovery]
  • May 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • May 01, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • April 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Bond ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Joinder]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 15, 2022: [Strike ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joinder]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sever Count(s)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [Joinder]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 13, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Joinder]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • February 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • February 13, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • February 13, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 12, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • February 11, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • February 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • January 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 14, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • January 14, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.