U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMERON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Probation Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Access]
  • September 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.