U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOUGHNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 13, 2022: [Vacate]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2022: [.Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • February 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 16, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.