U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PURDY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Convert Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Response to motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Error]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.