U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WUNDERLICH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.