U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GROSS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • February 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 18, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.