U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOGSDON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 02, 2022: [Modify]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Bond ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.