U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SQUIRES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address for Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.