U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00653-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRIED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Review]
  • January 24, 2022: [Revoke]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.