U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00006
  • Case Name: MATTRESS BY APPOINTMENT LLC v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 10, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 26, 2022: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.