U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VOLLAN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Disclosure ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.