U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHILES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [.Order]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 16, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • February 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.