U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARMSTRONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Vacate]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Travel ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Distribution of Funds]
  • February 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.