U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BEDDINGFIELD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.