U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VOLLAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Bond ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
  • April 21, 2022: [.Order]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.