U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LICHTENSTEIN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [.Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Permit]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • September 12, 2022: [Clarify]
  • September 07, 2022: [Permit]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • July 15, 2022: [Clarify]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 17, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • February 10, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Review]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2022: [Stay]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • February 07, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.