U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GERWATOWSKI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.