U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PALENCIA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 11, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.