U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KAO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • April 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [Travel ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 03, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • February 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.