U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00018
  • Case Name: FOURWORLD EVENT OPPORTUNITES, LP et al v. DODDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 31, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Stay]
  • April 22, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 22, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • February 10, 2022: [Declaration]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion For Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.