U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HONEYCUTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Access]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.