U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAXWELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.