U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2022: [Access]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.