U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VINCENT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 23, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 22, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Appear]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.