U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-pr-09999
  • Case Name: REDACTED PRA 18 U.S.C. 3123 DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER NO. 22-05 (BAH)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.