U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FERREIRA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address for Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.