U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOSES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Proposed Order of Forfeiture]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Reply to Opposition]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.