U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LENTZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Probation Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 22, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 17, 2022: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.