U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PANAYIOTOU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.