U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WINCHESTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • February 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.