U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RADER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revoke]
  • October 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Errata]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 02, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.