U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GROSS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.