U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WAYNICK et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Appear]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 14, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2022
  • March 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.