U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZOYGANELES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.